MA H1926 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4272

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Gentile of Sudbury, a petition of Carmine L. Gentile and others for the adoption of resolutions memorializing the Congress of the United States to convene a Constitutional Convention to consider amendments to the Constitution to limit the influence of money in our political system. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For a United States constitutional amendment and amendments convention

Sponsors

Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Cory Atkins [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. James Dwyer [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. James Miceli [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Jeffrey Sanchez [D]
Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4272
2017-11-03JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2017-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/09/17 from 2:00PM-5:00PM in B-2
2017-10-16JointHearing rescheduled to 11/08/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 & B-2
2017-10-16JointHearing scheduled for 11/08/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 & B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H2154 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4521
H1922 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question on adoption
H1929 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3196 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H4272 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback