MA H1921 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the participation of health care professionals in the torture and abuse of prisoners. Public Health.
Title
Prohibiting the participation of healthcare professionals in the torture and abuse of prisoners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4638 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1255 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1831 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H647 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H3322 (Similar To) 2015-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3375
H3362 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H1255 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1831 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H647 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H3322 (Similar To) 2015-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3375
H3362 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1921 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1921.pdf |