MA H1921 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a public school grant program for expanding learning time and improving student success. Education.
Title
Establishing a grant program for expanding learning time and improving student success
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Carlo Basile [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. John Mahoney [D] | Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] | Rep. Alice Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-24 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2011-06-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint committee on Rules |
2011-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1921 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13890&generalCourtId=1 |