MA H1904 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of licenses to applicants for marriage and family therapist, rehabilitation counselors and mental health counselors. Public Health.
Title
Relative to marriage and family therapists, rehabilitation counselors, mental health counselors, educational psychologists, applied behavior analysts; licenses; qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2019-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2979 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1904 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1904.pdf |