MA H19 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Teachers' Retirement System (House, No. 16) as relates to the interest charged on refund buybacks. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the interest charged on refund buybacks
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H17 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H3977 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - New draft substituted, see H4699
S2577 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4699 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H3977 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - New draft substituted, see H4699
S2577 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4699 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H19 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H19.pdf |