MA H189 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4895
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the rights of certain children in custody to move forward with adoption superseding the rights of the biological parents. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing that the rights of a child to supersede the rights of the biological rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4895 |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1652 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1859 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S123 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2616
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4895 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H243 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1859 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S123 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2616
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S826 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H4895 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H243 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H189 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H189.pdf |