MA H1881 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4502
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of cell phones while operating a motor vehicle within school zones. Transportation.
Title
Relative to safe driving in school speed zones
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] |
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4502 |
2017-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1908 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2058
H1619 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
S108 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2431
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3664 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2431 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Ways and Means
H4502 (Replaced by) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1619 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
S108 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2431
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3664 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2431 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Ways and Means
H4502 (Replaced by) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1881 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1881.pdf |