MA H1871 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating unfair trade practices in the sale of alcoholic beverages to wholesalers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Further regulating unfair trade practices in the sale of alcoholic beverages to wholesalers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4459 |
2011-05-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4459 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1871 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13916&generalCourtId=1 |