MA H187 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of tenant/host brewer licenses for the purpose of producing and packaging beer. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to tenant brewers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1941 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
H1835 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H358 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
H359 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S290
H2495 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1835 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H358 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
H359 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S290
H2495 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H187 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H187.pdf |