MA H186 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require learners or apprentices employed by a journeyman electrician to be registered with the Division of Apprentice Training. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to apprentice electricians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4042 |
2013-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4042 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H3636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H186 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H186.pdf |