MA H1857 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the impact of undocumented aliens residing in the commonwealth. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the impact of undocumented aliens residing in the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-02-15 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
2012-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2012 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1857 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8245&generalCourtId=1 |