MA H1834 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4137

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the collective bargaining rights of certain administrative employees. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect the collective bargaining rights of certain administrative employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-18HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4137
2023-04-18JointHearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H4137 (Replaced by) 2023-10-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback