MA H1830 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to low digit number plates on leased vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to low digit number plates on leased vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1998 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1991 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1909 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2299
S1939 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
S1920 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S1991 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1909 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2299
S1939 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
S1920 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1830 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1830.pdf |