MA H1828 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - No further action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - No further action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a biennial state budget. Ways and Means (Joint).
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution providing for a two year budget process for the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Steven Levy [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
Rep. George Peterson [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] |
Rep. Donald Wong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Joint | No further action |
2012-06-06 | Joint | Joint session held and dissolved |
2012-03-14 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, June 6, 2012 |
2011-10-12 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, March 14, 2012 |
2011-07-13 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 13, 2011 |
2011-05-09 | House | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2011-05-05 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1828 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9968&generalCourtId=1 |