MA H1824 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improving the efficiency and effectiveness of the type II noise barrier implementation plan. Transportation.
Title
Establishing a special commission to identify opportunities to improve the efficiency and effectiveness of type II noise barrier implementation plan
Sponsors
Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4649 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 10:00AM-12:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1824 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1824.pdf |