MA H1817 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to voluntarily issue driver's licenses and special identification card designations to persons with intellectual disabilities or autism spectrum disorder. Transportation.
Title
Relative to proactively protecting automotive drivers
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Kate Campanale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H1820 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4388
H1278 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H1820 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4388
H1278 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1817 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1817.pdf |