MA H1808 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to land in Bernardston. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to land in Bernardston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2953 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1790 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2708 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1334 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4077 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2019
H4094 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2020
H1790 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2708 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1334 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4077 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2019
H4094 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1808 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1808.pdf |