MA H179 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of an interagency council to address inequality, promote opportunity and end poverty. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
To address inequality, promote opportunity, and end poverty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2019-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H1440 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H179 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H179.pdf |