MA H1788 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to procurement services for artists. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to procurement services for artists
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] |
Rep. David Vieira [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-01-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1786 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1787 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1893 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2590 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1668 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H743 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1787 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1893 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2590 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1668 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H743 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1788 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1788.pdf |