MA H1771 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to address workplace bullying, mobbing and harrassment without regard to protected class status. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Addressing workplace bullying, mobbing, and harassment, without regard to protected class status
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-08-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-08-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1771 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1771.pdf |