MA H176 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reducing the size of certain classes and enhancing student opportunity for achievement and results. Education.
Title
Enhancing student opportunity for achievement and results
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H176 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11547&generalCourtId=1 |