MA H1759 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4831

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing medical civil rights. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing medical civil rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-22HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4831
2024-04-01SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-07-19JointHearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S1047 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
H1536 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
S953 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H3863 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Senate concurred
H4831 (Replaced by) 2024-07-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback