MA H1747 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require landscape sprinkler systems to be constructed with automatic shutoff valves with rain sensor devices. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to landscape sprinkler systems
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-03-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Weymouth Town Hall |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1747 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12291&generalCourtId=1 |