MA H1733 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 101-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Accompanied S983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Accompanied S983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pay equity. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To establish pay equity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-03 | Senate | Accompanied S983 |
2015-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S983 (Replaced by) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2107
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1733 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1733.pdf |