MA H173 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to vertical integration of medical marijuana businesses. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to vertical integration of medical marijuana businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4546 |
2021-06-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/29/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
H148 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
S64 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
H181 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H169 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1583 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H4546 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H176 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
S2663 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H148 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
S64 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
H181 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H169 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1583 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H4546 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H176 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
S2663 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H173.pdf |