MA H173 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4445
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that rebates on retail sales be made at the time of such purchases. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Affecting the payment of rebates in retail stores
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4445 |
2013-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H4445 (Replaced by) 2014-09-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H173 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H173.pdf |