MA H1720 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to investment in a transitional employment program for hard to employ adults. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to investment in a transitional employment program for hard to employ adults
Sponsors
Rep. Gloria Fox [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Martin Walsh [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4209 |
2013-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4209 (Replaced by) 2014-06-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1720 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1720.pdf |