MA H1709 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-19-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit marriage of minors. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To end child marriage in Massachusetts

Sponsors

Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]
Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Kelly Pease [R]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Marc Lombardo [R]
Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Carol Doherty [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Meghan Kilcoyne [D]
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Sally Kerans [D]
Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Sen. Susan Moran [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-09SenateSenate concurred
2022-04-19HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-03-24SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback