MA H1702 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protections for sexual assault survivors. The Judiciary.
Title
Improving protections for sexual assault survivors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2478 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2476 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2550
S2723 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Adopted
S2476 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2550
S2723 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1702 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1702.pdf |