MA H1702 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1025
Note: Replaces legislation S1146
Note: Replaces legislation S1146
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to donations of food to persons in need. The Judiciary.
Title
Encouraging the donation of food to persons in need
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-02-28 | House | Accompanied by S954, S1025, S1063 and S1146 |
2021-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1025 (Replaces) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1146 (Replaces) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1025 (Replaces) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1146 (Replaces) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1702 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1702.pdf |