MA H1686 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4218
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance prison inmate rehabilitation and decrease incarceration costs through prison industries programs. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase prison inmate rehabilitation and decrease costs of incarceration
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Winslow [R] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Matthew Beaton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4218 |
2014-04-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2014 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4218 (Replaced by) 2014-07-03 - Reported, in part, by H1590
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1686 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1686.pdf |