MA H166 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the creation of low profit limited liability company small businesses. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to creating low profit limited liability companies
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Carlos Henriquez [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2013-06-10 | House | Accompanied by H167 |
2013-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H167 (Replaces) 2013-06-10 - Accompanied H166
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H166 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H166.pdf |