MA H1654 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3786
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3786
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the terms of certain public employee collective bargaining agreements. Public Service.
Title
To clarify terms of collective bargaining agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3786 |
2011-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3786 (Replaced by) 2011-11-02 - New draft substituted, see H3789
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1654 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11885&generalCourtId=1 |