MA H1653 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the pay of first responders out of work due to needlestick injuries suffered in the line of duty. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to needle stick injuries suffered by first responders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-27HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-04-19JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H2016 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S793 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H1569 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2735 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback