MA H1641 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of an employee under the labor laws for certain persons performing services. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the definition of an independent contractor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5123 |
2019-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1649 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2310 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1649 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2310 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1641 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1641.pdf |