MA H164 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5088
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to human service coordinator caseload ratios established by the Department of Developmental Services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Improving front-line service coordinators quality of care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5088 |
2019-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H158 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4495
H2211 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2211 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H164 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H164.pdf |