MA H1631 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to judicial case managers and assistant judicial case managers for the Middlesex Probate and Family Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to judicial case managers and assistant judicial case managers for the Middlesex Probate and Family Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4500 |
2021-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1632 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4500
H4500 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4500 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1631 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1631.pdf |