MA H1623 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to commuter transit tax benefits. Revenue.
Title
Relative to commuter transit benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-05-04 | House | Accompanied by S1545 |
2017-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1545 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied H1623
S1570 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3305 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
S1570 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3305 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1623 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1623.pdf |