MA H1618 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an innocence commission to analyze the circumstances of innocent persons being charged, prosecuted, convicted and incarcerated. The Judiciary.
Title
To establish the Massachusetts innocence commission
Sponsors
Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Rep. Gloria Fox [D] | Rep. Ellen Story [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1618 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1618.pdf |