MA H157 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4578
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to enhancing consumer protection and transparency under the social work licensing law. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To enhance consumer protection and transparency under the social work licensing law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4578 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4578 (Replaced by) 2016-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H157.pdf |