MA H153 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Accompanied a study order, H4413
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Accompanied a study order, H4413
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study issues relative to education. [COMMITTEE].
Title
Resolve to fulfill the promise of education reform by ensuring adequate funding for student success
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, H4413 |
2011-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H153 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7916&generalCourtId=1 |