MA H1507 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to income tax credits for the design and manufacture of video games. Revenue.
Title
Relative to increasing economic development and business opportunity in the design and manufacture of video games through the use of tax credits
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. Michael Finn [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. John Mahoney [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1628 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1504 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H1473 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1534 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1546 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H1622 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1504 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H1473 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1534 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1546 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H1622 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1507 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1507.pdf |