MA H15 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4612
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Inspector General (House, No. 8) as relates to the MassDOT internal special audit unit. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the MassDOT internal special audit unit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4612 |
2016-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4612 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H9 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H10 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H11 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H12 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H13 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H9 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H10 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H11 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H12 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H13 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H15 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H15.pdf |