MA H1491 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the number of associate justices in Probate and Family Court. The Judiciary.
Title
To improve the administration of justice in probate and family court
Sponsors
Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Carol Doherty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4517 |
2023-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1138 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1457 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S1127 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1936 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Accompanied S1231
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1457 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S1127 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1936 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Accompanied S1231
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1491 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1491.pdf |