MA H1486 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-21 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-21 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the use of solitary confinement in correctional facilities. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the appropriate use of solitary confinement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-06-16 | House | Discharged from committee and recommitted to the committee on The Judiciary |
2014-06-16 | House | Reported on a part of H4180 |
2014-06-16 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2014-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4180 |
2014-04-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2014 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4180 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H1486
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1486 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1486.pdf |