MA H1469 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2457
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the repeal or reform of certain archaic laws on religion, piety, and morality. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the repeal or reform of certain unenforceable or unconstitutional archaic laws on religion, piety, and morality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2457 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2457 (Replaced by) 2024-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2551
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1469 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1469.pdf |