MA H1468 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4062
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sales tax of candy and soda. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the sales tax of candy and soda
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4062 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
S198 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S1643 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1650 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1619 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1578 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3341 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4062 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S198 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S1643 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1650 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1619 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1578 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3341 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4062 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1468 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1468.pdf |