MA H1452 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to access to state funded counsel during sex offender classification hearings. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing state funded counsel for sex offender classification hearings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3476 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S954 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1438 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1019 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1003 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3416 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3418 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback