MA H1445 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to survivor benefits of emergency medical technicians. Public Service.
Title
Relative to surviving family of emergency medical technicians
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-02-28 | House | Accompanied by S1461 |
2017-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1365 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1374 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1461 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied H1445
H1365 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1374 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1461 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied H1445
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1445.pdf |