MA H1443 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring notice to landlords relating to gas or electric shutoffs. Housing.
Title
Requiring notice to landlords relating to gas or electric shutoffs
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H1813 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4886 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1813 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4886 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1443 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1443.pdf |